U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00330
  • Case Name: Prince Khidr A. Rashid
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [13 Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Transfer of Claim]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Dismiss Case]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Transfer of Claim]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.