U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00209-
  • Case Name: Sabir Muhammad
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Examination]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Opposition]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.