U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00332-
  • Case Name: Maurice Tyrone Perry
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Declaration Re: eSR Submission]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [List of Creditors]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.