U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00299-
  • Case Name: Dana Bacon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice - Generic]
  • April 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.