U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00003-
  • Case Name: 76 M Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under 11 U.S.C. § 363(f)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Sell]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under 11 U.S.C. § 363(f)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Borrow]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Employ]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Application to Employ]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Failure to Prosecute]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • December 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
November, 2024
  • November 18, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Request to Withdraw Document]
  • November 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approve]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.