U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00334-
  • Case Name: Koleta M. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Withdrawal of Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Debtor Education (Original or Amended)]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amend/Modify]
November, 2024
  • November 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
October, 2024
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.