U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00071-
  • Case Name: Angela C Polk
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule A/B]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Debtor Education (Original or Amended)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice Of Requirement To File A Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Converting Case From Ch 13 To Ch 7]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule J]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule I]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.