U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00319-
  • Case Name: Paul Edward Dupree
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Opposition]
November, 2024
  • November 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.