U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00336
  • Case Name: Monique L. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Transfer of Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Transfer of Claim]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Proposed Order]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • October 05, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • October 05, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • October 05, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • October 05, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • October 05, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 05, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.