U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CERVANTES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.