U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00253-
  • Case Name: Superstar Elizabeth, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) AP]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.