U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00113-2
  • Case Name: USA v. GIRON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 16, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 16, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [.Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • March 28, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Waiver]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Bond ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.