U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00306-
  • Case Name: 4022 Georgia Avenue LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Objection to Unsecured Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Compensation]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
February, 2025
  • February 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Reply]
  • February 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Opposition]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Close Adversary Case]
  • December 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Objection]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Compensation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.