U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-mc-00119
  • Case Name: IN RE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO MERRICK GARLAND
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2024: [Appear by Telephone]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2024: [Response to motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.