U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00339-
  • Case Name: GA Views Management, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approve Compromise Under FRBP 9019]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Failure to Prosecute]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approve Compromise Under FRBP 9019]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Request to Withdraw Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • January 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
December, 2024
  • December 13, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • December 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • October 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.