U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02645
  • Case Name: CALIFORNIA TABLE GRAPE COMMISSION et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Joint Appendix]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.