U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02651
  • Case Name: HECNY SHIPPING LTD. v. HYC LOGISTICS, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • May 12, 2025: [Case Transferred Out]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of QC **DO NOT USE- FOR REPORTING PURPOSES ONLY.**]
  • April 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • March 27, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.