U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03282
  • Case Name: INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Case Stayed]
  • October 11, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.