U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02321
  • Case Name: CARRANZA et al v. QUINTANILLA FOODS, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Status Report Order]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: [Order Referring Case to Mediation (Circuit Executive's Office)]
October, 2024
  • October 12, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.