U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00329
  • Case Name: FISHER v. YELLEN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 06, 2025: [Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 13, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.