U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03512
  • Case Name: KING v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.