U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00345-
  • Case Name: 2626 Penn LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Secured Claim]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (by Order)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
February, 2025
  • February 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • February 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • February 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opportunity to Object (Correction)]
  • January 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • December 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 16, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.