U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00049-
  • Case Name: Kimberly A Poindexter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order - Generic]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice - Generic]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Affidavit]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
November, 2024
  • November 17, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Opposition]
  • November 13, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2024
  • October 19, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.