U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01062
  • Case Name: CAMIRE et al v. ALCOA USA CORP. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • May 13, 2025: [Response to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Alter Judgment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.