U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03051
  • Case Name: VOIP-PAL.COM, INC v. AT&T INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Waiver of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • May 02, 2025: [Waiver of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 25, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.