U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00237-
  • Case Name: John Nolan White, II
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending creditor list or schedules A-J)]
  • April 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Proposed Order]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Compensation]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Dismiss Case]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order for Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend/Shorten Time]
January, 2025
  • January 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
October, 2024
  • October 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.