U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00376-
  • Case Name: Lucy Reba Edwards
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
January, 2025
  • January 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • January 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • November 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.