U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00246-
  • Case Name: MP PPH LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Notice - Generic]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Operating Report]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Administrative Expenses]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing of Transcript]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Notice - Generic]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Compel]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Response]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Order]
  • March 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Administrative Expenses]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Stipulation]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Proof of Claim Attachment 3001(c)(1) and (d)]
  • January 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • January 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Bradley, Jones, Liquidating Trustee [Response]
December, 2024
  • December 29, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 13, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • December 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • December 05, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 05, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.