U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00370-
  • Case Name: Natalie Marie Tucker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
  • February 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
November, 2024
  • November 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.