U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00226-4
  • Case Name: USA v. BASSIL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 06, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 21, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 19, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 17, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2025
  • January 11, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
November, 2024
  • November 10, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.