U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03239
  • Case Name: MILLER v. YORK COUNTY REGIONAL POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • April 21, 2025: [Case Transferred Out]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: [.Order]
December, 2024
  • December 17, 2024: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.