U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00382-
  • Case Name: Doriann Renee Thomas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [13 Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Converting Case to 11]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Appearance (Attorney)]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employ]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Appearance (Attorney)]
November, 2024
  • November 16, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.