U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00390
  • Case Name: Solution Engineering for Reliable and Viable Enter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Compensation]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Order Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Notice - Generic]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Compensation]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Amended Motion for Relief from Stay]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Order]
  • January 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending creditor list or schedules A-J)]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • November 18, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Resolution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.