U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00393-
  • Case Name: Maria Denise Reddick
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Exhibit]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Operating Report]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Amended Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Operating Report]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Objection]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Operating Report]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Relief from Stay]
  • March 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • February 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Operating Report]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Operating Report]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • November 21, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.