U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00518-1
  • Case Name: USA v. YANT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [.Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.