U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03304
  • Case Name: WILLIAMS v. META VERSE, LLC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 03, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.