U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00406-
  • Case Name: Darrell Len Moyers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Dismiss Case Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 521(a),1307(c)(9), or 707(a)(3)]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
  • December 05, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2024
  • November 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.