U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01573
  • Case Name: RAMIREZ v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • May 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 18, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 18, 2025: [Alter Judgment]
November, 2024
  • November 28, 2024: [Extension of Time to]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.