U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03024
  • Case Name: WANG v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: [Remark- Consolidation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.