U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00413-
  • Case Name: Trinna Moore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Change of Address]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
December, 2024
  • December 19, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • December 19, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • December 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.