U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00416-
  • Case Name: Cracked Eggery Inc
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Operating Report]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Operating Report]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Response]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Notice - Generic]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Status Report]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence Allen [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • December 19, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence A. [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • December 17, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Katz, Lawrence A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.