U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00415-
  • Case Name: Peek, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Secured Claim]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Employ]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Balance Sheet]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • December 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.