U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00421-
  • Case Name: Balance Holding Company, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Operating Report]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Amended Application/Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Notice of Failure to Prosecute]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Amended Application/Motion]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Amended Employ]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Periodic Report Re: Related Entities]
  • January 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • January 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [Equity Security Holders (Original or Amended)]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 15, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Shortall, Angela [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.