U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03164
  • Case Name: ALLIANCE FOR RECREATIONAL CANNABIS ENTITIES, LLC v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • April 28, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 25, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Briefing Schedule]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.