U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00431
  • Case Name: Lavenia Maria Bailey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
February, 2025
  • February 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Debtor Education (Original or Amended)]
  • January 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
December, 2024
  • December 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 21, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Exhibit]
  • December 21, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.