U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03346
  • Case Name: PHARMAESSENTIA USA CORPORATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Joint Appendix]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.