U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03531
  • Case Name: PYVOVAR et al v. BLINKEN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 24, 2024: [Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.