U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00434-
  • Case Name: Laura Elizabeth Bentley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Complaint]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employ]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
December, 2024
  • December 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.