U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00439-
  • Case Name: Shadonna Renee Graham
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order - Generic]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Debtor Education (Original or Amended)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order - Generic]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Show Cause]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order for Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Held (BK)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
January, 2025
  • January 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.