U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00412-
  • Case Name: Leon Fisher, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Secured Claim]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [13 Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Dismiss Case]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • January 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.